Faragalla, Hala Fayek Farid (CPSO#: 86960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Ext. 2959
Fax: (416) 864-5146
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HALA FAYEK FARID FARAGALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAGALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2013