Farah, Sameh Saad (CPSO#: 51605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: (705) 450-6106
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEH SAAD FARAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986