Faraji, Hamidreza (CPSO#: 85220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pathology
2N-24
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76313
Fax: (905) 577-0198
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

105 CHAMBERS DRIVE
Ancaster ON  L9K 0J1
Canada
Phone: 905 6484854
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Faraji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Faraji ( CPSO# 85220 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pathology
2N-24 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAMIDREZA FARAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2012