Farazli, Christiane (CPSO#: 28541)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Farazli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jul 2014
Summary:

 
On July 24, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Farazli committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that she has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession, she has contravened the Act, the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 or the 
regulations under either of those Acts and, she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee also 
found that Dr. Farazli is incompetent. Dr. Farazli pleaded no contest to the allegations. 
 
This case comprises two s. 75(1)(a) investigations into Dr. Farazli's practice, as well as twenty 
patient complaints. 
 
Dr. Farazli owned and operated an out-of-hospital premises where she conducted colonoscopies 
and gastroscopies. The premises were subject to inspection/assessment by the College's Out-of 
Hospital Premises Inspection Programme in May 2011. As a result of that inspection, largely on 
the basis of serious infection control concerns, the premises received a grade of "fail", which 
meant that Dr. Farazli could no longer perform procedures there as of early June 2011. After 
receiving this information from the College, Ottawa Public Health conducted a retrospective 
review, a "look-back", and notified several thousand of Dr. Farazli's former patients that they 
may have been exposed to Hepatitis C virus, Hepatitis B virus, or HIV and should be tested for 
these pathogens.  
 
An expert retained by the College opined that Dr. Farazli failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession and displayed incompetence in the unacceptable practice at the clinic, 
including in her infection control and instrument re-processing failures; the lack of training and 
certification of her staff; her failure to provide and maintain an adequate facility; and lack of 
emergency preparedness. Another expert opined that the care provided to the patients did not 
meet the standard of practice reasonably expected of a competent practitioner in the field of 
gastroenterology. In particular, Dr. Farazli did not consider it necessary to offer to patients and 
referring physicians reasonable options for management. 
 
In respect to Patient A, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in her interaction with the nurse and the patient in respect of Patient A's care and in 
exposing Patient A to potential infection. Patient A saw Dr. Farazli on four occasions between 
1997 and 2010 for various procedures.  
 
In respect to Patient B, Dr. Farazli failed to maintain the standard of care in proposing to engage 
a sales representative to assist her in a procedure when no nurse was available. Dr. Farazli 
engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to Patient B in 
proposing to engage a sales representative to assist her in a procedure when no nurse was 
available, and in engaging in inappropriate and incomplete communications with Patient B. 
Patient B attended Dr. Farazli in about March 2010 for a colonoscopy. 
 
In respect to Patient C, Dr. Farazli failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in 
relation to her care and treatment of Patient C. Dr. Farazli also engaged in disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in her communications with the patient including 
comments about pain management; in being rough and callous with the patient; and in exposing 
the patient to potential infection. Patient C attended Dr. Farazli's office for a procedure in January 
2011, having been referred for a complaint of rectal bleeding and a family history of colorectal 
cancer, for a colonoscopy and removal of a polyp. The patient expressed that she was 
experiencing extreme pain during the procedure. 
 
In respect to Patient D, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in her communications with Patient D, in persisting with the procedure despite the 
patient's request to stop due to unbearable pain, and in exposing the patient to potential infection. 
Patient D attended at Dr. Farazli for a colonoscopy and gastroscopy in 2003 or 2004. During the 
procedure, the patient experienced severe pain and asked Dr. Farazli to stop the procedure due to 
pain.  
 
In respect to Patient E, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient E in failing to provide the patient with enough sedation to be 
comfortable and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient E was referred to Dr. 
Farazli by her family physician for a colonoscopy in 2002 and experienced terrible pain during 
the procedure.   
 
In respect to Patient F, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional 
conduct in not providing the patient with enough sedation to be comfortable, and in being 
callous, unprofessional and disrespectful in her communication with the patient and in her pain 
management, and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient F was referred to Dr. 
Farazli by her family physician for a colonoscopy. During the colonoscopy, she experienced 
severe discomfort, but Dr. Farazli disregarded her complaints of pain.  
 
In respect to Patient G, Dr. Farazli failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in 
relation to Patient G in her documentation. Dr. Farazli further engaged in disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in her callous and unprofessional communication with 
Patient G, and in failing to stop the procedure despite the patient complaining of unbearable pain 
and inadequate anaesthesia. Patient G underwent procedures by Dr. Farazli in about 2000 and 
2001.   
 
In respect to Patient H, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient H in her callous, unprofessional, rough and hurried examination of 
the patient; in her communications with the patient; in continuing with the procedure when the 
patient was in excruciating pain; and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient H 
underwent a gastroscopy and colonoscopy by Dr. Farazli in March 2009.   
 
In respect to Patient I, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient I in her inappropriate communications with the patient; her failure 
to be responsive to the patient's complaints of lack of sufficient anaesthesia; and in exposing 
Patient I to potential infection. Patient I was treated by Dr. Farazli in about 2007 after a referral 
by her family physician for a gastroscopy and colonoscopy.  
 
In respect to Patient J, Dr. Farazli failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and 
displayed incompetence in relation to Patient J by giving inadequate analgesic. Further, Dr. 
Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to Patient J in 
her communications with the patient; in proceeding with an excruciating procedure despite the 
patient screaming in pain; and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient J was 
referred to Dr. Farazli by her family physician for a colonoscopy in about 2002. 
 
In respect to Patient K, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient K in her inappropriate and unprofessional communications with the 
patient; in failing to provide the patient with sufficient sedation; in charging the patient for a drug 
not administered; and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient K was referred to Dr. 
Farazli by her family physician in January 2002. 
 
In respect to Patient L, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient L in her callous and unprofessional communications with the 
patient; in her pain management; and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient L was 
referred to Dr. Farazli by her family physician in February 2000. She became very uncomfortable 
during the procedure, which was performed in March 2000. 
 
In respect to Patient M, Dr. Farazli contravened the regulations made under the Medicine Act in 
relation to Patient M by failing to maintain records in accordance with the regulation. Dr. Farazli 
also engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to Patient M in 
her callous, rough and unprofessional communications with the patient; charging for medications 
not needed for her procedure; and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient M was 
referred to Dr. Farazli by her family physician and underwent a procedure by Dr. Farazli in about 
April 2003. Patient M believed she saw Dr. Farazli again in 2010. Dr. Farazli did not have 
records of treatment for this patient.  
 
In respect to Patient N, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient N in her inappropriate and unprofessional communications with the 
patient; in proceeding with a procedure when the patient was in obvious distress from insufficient 
sedation; and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient N was treated by Dr. Farazli 
for a colonoscopy procedure in about July 2006.  
 
In respect to Patient O, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient O in her inappropriate and unprofessional communications with the 
patient; in proceeding with a procedure when the patient was in obvious distress from insufficient 
sedation; and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient O was seen by Dr. Farazli in 
2004 and 2009. Patient O experienced extreme pain during the colonoscopy. 
 
In respect to Patient P, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient P in her unprofessional communications with the patient and in 
exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient P saw Dr. Farazli in September and November 
2010. Dr. Farazli was unable to complete the procedure because she said she could not advance 
the scope.  
In respect to Patient Q, Dr. Farazli demonstrated incompetence in relation to Patient Q in that she 
displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment in not aborting the procedure. Further, Dr. 
Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to Patient Q 
in being abusive in her communications with the patient. Patient Q was referred to Dr. Farazli by 
her family physician in July 1999. The patient underwent a gastroscopy by Dr. Farazli in 
November 1999. Dr. Farazli had difficulty gaining intravenous access and Patient Q was in 
terrible pain. Dr. Farazli yelled at her and shouted at the nursing staff to hold Patient Q down 
while Dr. Farazli attempted to insert the IV and to spray the throat anaesthetic. Dr. Farazli then 
herself roughly pulled Patient Q's head to the side and sprayed her throat while she was 
struggling. After the procedure, Dr. Farazli was yelling very loudly at the patient, about the 
patient needing the procedure and not being cooperative.  
 
In respect to Patient R, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient R in her inappropriate and unprofessional communications with the 
patient and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient R was referred to Dr. Farazli by 
her family physician and underwent procedures by Dr. Farazli in 2006.  
 
In respect to Patient S, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient S in her inappropriate and unprofessional communications with the 
patient; in proceeding with a procedure when the patient was in obvious discomfort and felt there 
was insufficient sedation; and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient S was 
referred to Dr. Farazli by his family physician, and was treated by Dr. Farazli in 2004. When Dr. 
Farazli asked him about his history, she behaved in an accusatory way toward him. 
 
In respect to Patient T, Dr. Farazli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct in relation to Patient T in her inappropriate and unprofessional communications with the 
patient; in proceeding with a procedure when the patient was in obvious distress from insufficient 
sedation; and in exposing the patient to potential infection. Patient T saw Dr. Farazli on several 
occasions between 1997 and 2002. In 2002, the patient underwent a colonoscopy and was caused 
excruciating pain by the procedure.  
 
Dr. Farazli has executed an undertaking never to engage in the practice of medicine again. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
"     Dr. Farazli appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
"     Dr. Farazli pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date 
of this Order.  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 24, 2014