Farber, Earl Pelig (CPSO#: 16520)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Mar 1965 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002