Farber, Emmanuel (CPSO#: 12031)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1942

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 29 Mar 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1946
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1995