Farhan, Maryam (CPSO#: 103447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
883 Mulock Dr.
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8S3
Phone: 905-235-3825
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM FARHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016