Farion, Kenneth John (CPSO#: 66841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2318
Fax: (613) 738-4952
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.J. Farion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Farion ( CPSO# 66841 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH JOHN FARION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998