Faris, Matthew Weir (CPSO#: 55657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of PM&R
Providence Care Hospital
752 King St. West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 51718
Fax: (613) 544-4614
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.W. Faris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Faris ( CPSO# 55657 )

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW WEIR FARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986