Farivar, Iraj (CPSO#: 19754)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Persian

Education:University of Brussels, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000