Farivar-Mohseni, Hesam (CPSO#: 65206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 451-1611
Fax: (905) 451-1622
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hesam Farivar-Mohseni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Farivar-Mohseni ( CPSO# 65206 )

Business Address:
203 - 2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 451-1611

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HESAM FARIVAR-MOHSENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARIVAR-MOHSENI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993