Farjalla, Salaheddin Goma (CPSO#: 72935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
209-700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 971-5364
Fax: (519) 971-8639
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salaheddin Farjalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2008


Corporation Name: Salaheddin Farjalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Farjalla ( CPSO# 72935 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone Number: (519) 971-5364

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALAHEDDIN GOMA FARJALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARJALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 16 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 17 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 16 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 17 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2004