Farkashidy, Joseph (CPSO#: 17199)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hungarian

Education:Peter Pazmany University of Budapest, 1938

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1959
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 1997