Farkouh, Michael Edward (CPSO#: 59415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
Unniversity Health Network
585 University Avenue
4N474
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3141
Fax: (416) 340-3398
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL EDWARD FARKOUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARKOUH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989