Farmer, James Patrick (CPSO#: 50523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson 2 Rm 262D
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2169
Fax: (613) 546-2731
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Vincent Hospital
60 Cambridge St
Ottawa ON  K1R7A5
Canada
Phone: 613-562-6262 Ext. 2095
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Pathology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 7G8
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79082
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Farmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Saux ( CPSO# 50924 )
Dr. J. Farmer ( CPSO# 50523 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson Eye Care Centre
166 Brock Centre
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK FARMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARMER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984