Farmer, Patricia Louise (CPSO#: 55662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Koval Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2014


Corporation Name: Patricia Farmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Farmer ( CPSO# 55662 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology & Molecular Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 16 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA LOUISE FARMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986