Farnell, Barbara Anne (CPSO#: 50524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone: (613) 546-6652
Fax: (613) 546-5292
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Farnell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Farnell ( CPSO# 50524 )
Dr. B. Farnell ( CPSO# 55866 )

Business Address:
200 - 2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANNE FARNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARNELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1985