Farooq, Bushra (CPSO#: 87466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
475 charolais blvd
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Phone: (905) 454-3347
Fax: (905) 454-3288
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7070 Saint barbara blvd
Mississauga ON  L5W 0E6
Canada
Phone: (905) 565-9100
Fax: (905) 565-8973
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bushra Farooq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Farooq ( CPSO# 87466 )

Business Address:
475 Charolais Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Phone Number: (905) 454-3347

Business Address:
7070 Saint Barbara Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5W 0E6
Phone Number: (905) 565-9100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BUSHRA FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2009