Farooq, Omar (CPSO#: 66845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Point Walk In Clinic
9368 South Fort Drive
Fort Saskatchewan AB  T8L 0C5
Phone: (780) 997-0177
Fax: (780) 669-3979

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
Elective Trainee - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 02 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1998