Farquhar, Donald Robert (CPSO#: 50526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room B9-108A
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 646-6227
Fax: (519) 663-3291
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
Grovesnor Site
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6227
Fax: (519) 663-3291
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farquhar Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Myers ( CPSO# 58160 )
Dr. D. Farquhar ( CPSO# 50526 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6227

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 646-6142

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD ROBERT FARQUHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARQUHAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985