Farrash, Faisal Abdulhamid O (CPSO#: 104937)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2014 to 07 Nov 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017