Farrell, Catherine Ann (CPSO#: 50527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Sainte-Justine
3175 Chemin de la Cote Ste-Catherin
Montreal QC  H3T 1C5
Phone: (514) 345-4931 Ext. 2977
Fax: (514) 345-7731

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANN FARRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1985