Farrell, Jamie Bernard (CPSO#: 84136)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2006 to 30 Apr 2006
Elective Trainee - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Aug 2006 to 01 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012