Farrell, Mark Raymond (CPSO#: 56758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2900
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Farrell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farrell ( CPSO# 56758 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK RAYMOND FARRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988