Farrell, Robert Thomas Christopher (CPSO#: 62803)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002