Farren, Stanley Blake (CPSO#: 59981)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004