Farrington, William Charles (CPSO#: 17941)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 14 Jul 2009

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2009

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jan 2009
Summary:

 On January 9, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Farrington has committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practise.  The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Farrington to pay to the College 
 costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.  As well, the Committee 
 ordered the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 9, 2009