Farwan, Khader Mohammed (CPSO#: 50033)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988