Farzad, Fatemeh (CPSO#: 65712)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Tehran, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1995