Fasihy, Elham (CPSO#: 73891)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Iranian, Persian

Education:University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006