Fast, Mallory Denton (CPSO#: 42986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
343 Tache Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R2H 2A5
Phone: (204) 925-9552
Fax: (204) 231-2283
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. 2287
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALLORY DENTON FAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1981 to 14 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2004