Fathalla, Hussein Abdelrahman Mahmoud (CPSO#: 102462)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 20 Mar 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014