Fathollahzadeh, Afsoon (CPSO#: 69282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 430
2525 Old Bronte Rd.
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 842-3993
Fax: (905) 842-9260
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSOON FATHOLLAHZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATHOLLAHZADEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1997