Fatima, Anis (CPSO#: 99353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shoppers World Medical Centre
Suite 144
499 Main Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone: (905) 796-7127
Fax: (905) 796-3977
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fatima Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fatima ( CPSO# 99353 )

Business Address:
Shoppers World Medical Centre
Suite 144
499 Main Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone Number: (905) 796-7127

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIS FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2014