Fatima, Syeda (CPSO#: 78796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: 5197441167
Fax: 5197441168
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
King St West, Kitchener
Ontario.
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3611
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Syeda Fatima Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fatima ( CPSO# 78796 )

Business Address:
564 Belmon Avenue West
Suite 309
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 744-1167

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYEDA FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 01 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2007