Fattah, Abdul (CPSO#: 22110)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2002