Faucher, Catherine (CPSO#: 92979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Medical Group
4289 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K1E 0A8
Phone: (613) 686-1911
Fax: (613) 830-1901
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4635
Fax: 613-907-8041
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Faucher Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Faucher ( CPSO# 92979 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2

Business Address:
4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1C 1T1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE FAUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAUCHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012