Faught, Carolyn Ruth (CPSO#: 65440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8303
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crabtree Faught Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Faught ( CPSO# 65440 )
Dr. P. Crabtree ( CPSO# 66954 )

Business Address:
Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone Number: (613) 230-7788

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room 7232 P O Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN RUTH FAUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAUGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Nov 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993