Faught, John Wylam (CPSO#: 57365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Dept Ob/Gyne
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8560
Fax: (613) 737-8828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Wylam Faught Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Faught ( CPSO# 57365 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Room C2442A
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8937

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WYLAM FAUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAUGHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987