Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Faulds, Thomas Ross (CPSO#: 57141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Ext. 2048
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faulds Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Faulds ( CPSO# 57140 )
Dr. T. Faulds ( CPSO# 57141 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Business Address:
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone Number: (519) 473-4394

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS ROSS FAULDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAULDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1987