Faulkner, John Roger (CPSO#: 25589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 1973

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Willowdale ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 222-5242
Fax: (416) 222-1385
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.R. Faulkner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Faulkner ( CPSO# 25589 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-5242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROGER FAULKNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAULKNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1973
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 May 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 18 Jun 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Apr 2001
Summary:

 On April 26, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Faulkner(s guilty plea and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct with regard to the following:
Failing to fulfil terms of an 
 agreement for professional services;
Failure without reasonable cause to provide a report or 
 certificate relating to an examination or treatment performed by the member to his patient or his 
 authorized agent;
Failure to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written 
 inquiry from the College;
Engaging in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine 
 that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee directed the following 
 penalty:

Recorded reprimand;
Costs awarded to the College in the amount of $6,500 to be paid 
 within 30 days;
One-month suspension to commence no later than May 31, 2001;
Peer assessment of 
 office practice and office inspection to be conducted within one year at Dr. Faulkner(s expense 
 with the results to be reported to the Registrar who is directed to take appropriate action if the 
 results are unsatisfactory.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 26, 2001