Faulknor, Janice Yolanda (CPSO#: 70592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Jamaican Creole

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4000 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9L 3A2
Phone: 416-747-8484 Ext. 242
Fax: 416-747-8480
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE YOLANDA FAULKNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAULKNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998