Fausone, Gary Wilford (CPSO#: 85779)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008