Fauth-Silvestri, Simone Inis Luise (CPSO#: 72076)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Feb 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Fundacao Universitaria do ABC, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 08 Feb 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2000