Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fayaz, Imran (CPSO#: 62440)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Ahmed, Imran (used until: 03 Jul 1990 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014