Fayez, Raad Mahmoud Mohammad (CPSO#: 89976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Refrence Clinics
Kings Road
Jeddah 21423
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966 500300512
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raad Fayez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAAD MAHMOUD MOHAMMAD FAYEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAYEZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 20 Oct 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2012