Fayle, Brian William Knott (CPSO#: 16762)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2001