Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fazal, Haydarally Hasanalee (CPSO#: 32436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6633 Highway 7 East
Suite 204
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-0907
Fax: (905) 294-3926
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Davis Dr. , Ste. 301
Newmarket ON  L3Y2R3
Canada
Phone: 905-898-1851
Fax: 905-898-6839
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAYDARALLY HASANALEE FAZAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAZAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2017