Fazeli Chaghoshi, Leila (CPSO#: 87046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 221-7450
Fax: (416) 221-7024
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leila Fazeli Chaghoshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fazeli Chaghoshi ( CPSO# 87046 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 221-7450

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEILA FAZELI CHAGHOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAZELI CHAGHOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011