Feagan, Brian Gordon (CPSO#: 52987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital - LHSC
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (226) 270-7675
Fax: (519) 931-5278
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Robarts Clinical Trials Inc
100 Dundas Street, Suite 200
London ON  N6A 5B6
Canada
Phone: (226) 270-7675
Fax: (519) 931-5278
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian G. Feagan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Feagan ( CPSO# 52987 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (516) 685-8500

Business Address:
Suite 200
100 Dundas Street
London ON  N6A 5B6
Phone Number: (226) 270-7641


Corporation Name: Nancy Feagan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN GORDON FEAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEAGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Apr 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1988